AR HB1163 | 2010 | 87th General Assembly Fiscal

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-26 - House Notification that HB1163 is now Act 265

Summary

The Jodie Mahony Scholarship Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The Jodie Mahony Scholarship Act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-26 House Notification that HB1163 is now Act 265
2010-02-25 House Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2010-02-25 House TO BE ENROLLED
2010-02-25 House Returned From the Senate as passed.
2010-02-25 Senate Returned to the House as passed.
2010-02-25 Senate Read the third time and passed.
2010-02-24 Senate Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2010-02-24 Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
2010-02-24 Senate Received from the House.
2010-02-24 House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2010-02-24 House Motion to place on second reading for the purpose of amendment. Motion failed.
2010-02-23 House Returned by the Committee Do Pass
2010-02-22 House Re-referred to the Committee on House Select Committee on Rules
2010-02-22 House REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2010-02-22 House Amendment No. 1 and 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2010-02-22 House Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2010-02-22 House Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2010-02-16 House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on House Select Committee on Rules
2010-02-16 House Filed

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback