AR HB1153 | 2012 | 88th General Assembly Fiscal
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - House Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - House Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For The Arkansas Natural Resources Commission - River Bridge Construction, Repair, Preventive Maintenance, And Erosion Control Grants Appropriation For The 2012-2013 Fiscal Year.
Title
An Act For The Arkansas Natural Resources Commission - River Bridge Construction, Repair, Preventive Maintenance, And Erosion Control Grants Appropriation For The 2012-2013 Fiscal Year.
Sponsors
Rep. Garry Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-23 - House - Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. (Y: 84 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | House Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment. | |
2012-02-23 | House REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2012-02-23 | House Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. | |
2012-02-23 | House Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. | |
2012-02-13 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE | |
2012-02-10 | House Prefiled |