AR HB1091 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-04 - House Notification that HB1091 is now Act 174
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-04 - House Notification that HB1091 is now Act 174
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Provisions Regarding The Assessment And Collection Of Fees And Service Charges By County Solid Waste Management Systems; To Make Technical Corrections; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Amend The Provisions Regarding The Assessment And Collection Of Fees And Service Charges By County Solid Waste Management Systems; To Make Technical Corrections; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-24 - House - Senate amendment # 2 read and concurred in. (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 84 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 84 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-04 | House Notification that HB1091 is now Act 174 | |
2011-02-28 | House Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. | |
2011-02-24 | House TO BE ENROLLED | |
2011-02-24 | House CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED | |
2011-02-24 | House Senate amendment # 2 read and concurred in. | |
2011-02-24 | House Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. | |
2011-02-23 | House Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 and 2. | |
2011-02-16 | House Re-referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE | |
2011-02-16 | House Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 and #2. | |
2011-02-16 | Senate Returned To the House as passed as amended. | |
2011-02-16 | Senate EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED | |
2011-02-16 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-02-15 | Senate Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | |
2011-02-09 | Senate Re-referred to Senate Committee on City, County and Local Affairs | |
2011-02-09 | Senate REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-02-09 | Senate Amendment # 1and 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. | |
2011-02-09 | Senate Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 and 2 | |
2011-01-31 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on City, County and Local Affairs | |
2011-01-31 | Senate Received from the House. | |
2011-01-31 | House CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED | |
2011-01-31 | House EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED | |
2011-01-31 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-01-27 | House REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-01-27 | House Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. | |
2011-01-27 | House Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. | |
2011-01-26 | House Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2 | |
2011-01-25 | House REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-01-25 | House Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. | |
2011-01-25 | House Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. | |
2011-01-12 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on House Committee on City, County and Local Affairs | |
2011-01-12 | House Filed |