AR HB1085 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-14 - Notification that HB1085 is now Act 1
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

The General Appropriation Act For The 2021-2022 Fiscal Year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The General Appropriation Act For The 2021-2022 Fiscal Year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-14 - Senate - EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - House - Third Reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-14HouseNotification that HB1085 is now Act 1
2021-01-14HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2021-01-14HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2021-01-14HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2021-01-14SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2021-01-14SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2021-01-14SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-01-13SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2021-01-13SenateReceived from the House.
2021-01-13HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2021-01-13HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-01-12HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-01-11HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2021-01-05HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback