AR HB1065 | 2016 | 90th General Assembly Fiscal

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Notification that HB1065 is now Act 141
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The National Park College Appropriation For The 2016-2017 Fiscal Year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The National Park College Appropriation For The 2016-2017 Fiscal Year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-03HouseNotification that HB1065 is now Act 141
2016-04-27HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2016-04-27HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2016-04-27HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2016-04-27SenateReturned to the House as Passed.
2016-04-27SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2016-04-27SenateRead the third time and passed.
2016-04-26SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2016-04-26SenateReceived from the House.
2016-04-26HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2016-04-26HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2016-04-26HouseConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2016-04-26HouseRULES SUSPENDED
2016-04-21HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2016-04-13HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2016-03-18HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback