AR HB1054 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Notification that HB1054 is now Act 451
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Notification that HB1054 is now Act 451
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Designate A Portion Of U.s. Highway 65 As The "delta Rhythm & Bayous Highway".
Title
To Designate A Portion Of U.s. Highway 65 As The "delta Rhythm & Bayous Highway".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-06 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-14 | House | Notification that HB1054 is now Act 451 |
2017-03-07 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-03-06 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-03-06 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology, and Legislative Affairs |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-02-21 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-02-17 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-02-17 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-02-17 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-02-16 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2 |
2017-02-08 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-02-08 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-01-18 | House | Re-referred to reassign to transfer to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2017-01-09 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2016-12-21 | House | Filed |