AR HB1044 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-23 - Notification that HB1044 is now Act 160
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-23 - Notification that HB1044 is now Act 160
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Require That Cursive Writing Be Taught In Elementary School.
Title
To Require That Cursive Writing Be Taught In Elementary School.
Sponsors
Rep. Kim Hendren [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-19 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 66 N: 21 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 66 N: 21 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-23 | House | Notification that HB1044 is now Act 160 |
2015-02-19 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2015-02-19 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2015-02-19 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2015-02-12 | House | CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED |
2015-02-12 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-02-10 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-02-04 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-02-04 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2015-02-04 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2015-01-12 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2015-01-12 | House | Filed |