AR HB1041 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Notification that HB1041 is now Act 980
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Protect The Rights And Privileges Granted Under The Arkansas Constitution And The United States Constitution; And To Declare American Laws For American Courts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Protect The Rights And Privileges Granted Under The Arkansas Constitution And The United States Constitution; And To Declare American Laws For American Courts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-29 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 60 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 63 N: 24 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-06HouseNotification that HB1041 is now Act 980
2017-03-30HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2017-03-29HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2017-03-29HouseSenate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
2017-03-28HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
2017-03-20HouseRe-referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2017-03-20HouseReturned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2017-03-20SenateReturned To the House as passed as amended.
2017-03-20SenateRead the third time and passed.
2017-03-16SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-03-16SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2017-03-15SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2017-02-06SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
2017-02-06SenateReceived from the House.
2017-02-06HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2017-02-02HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2017-01-09HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2016-12-08HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback