AR HB1037 | 2024 | 94th General Assembly Fiscal
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For The Office Of Attorney General Appropriation For The 2024-2025 Fiscal Year.
Title
An Act For The Office Of Attorney General Appropriation For The 2024-2025 Fiscal Year.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2024-04-25 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2024-04-25 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2024-04-24 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2024-04-10 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE |
2024-04-02 | House | Filed |