AR HB1014 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 22 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

To Create The Teacher's Classroom Investment Deduction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Create The Teacher's Classroom Investment Deduction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-21 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House of Representatives - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 79 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-22HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2017-03-21HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2017-03-21HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2017-03-21SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2017-03-21SenateRead the third time and passed.
2017-03-20SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2017-03-16SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation
2017-03-16SenateReceived from the House.
2017-03-16HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2017-03-15HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-03-15HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2017-03-15HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2017-03-14HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
2017-01-31HouseRead the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
2017-01-31HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-01-31HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2017-01-31HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2017-01-09HouseIn accordance with House Rule 39 Read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE JOURNAL; ENGROSSED AND ENROLLED BILLS
2016-11-18HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback