AR HB1007 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly 1st Special
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Notification that HB1007 is now Act 1
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Notification that HB1007 is now Act 1
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law On Contribution And Expenditure Reports To Address The Effects Of Moving The Primary Elections To March; And To Amend Arkansas Law Resulting From Initiated Act 1 Of 1990 And Initiated Act 1 Of 1996.
Title
To Amend The Law On Contribution And Expenditure Reports To Address The Effects Of Moving The Primary Elections To March; And To Amend Arkansas Law Resulting From Initiated Act 1 Of 1990 And Initiated Act 1 Of 1996.
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Davis [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 71 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 71 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-29 | House | Notification that HB1007 is now Act 1 |
2015-05-28 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2015-05-28 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2015-05-28 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2015-05-27 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-05-26 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-05-26 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2015-05-26 | House | Filed |