AR HB1003 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 15 2016 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-17 - Re-referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

To Create An Income Tax Exemption For Retirement And Survivor Benefits From The Uniformed Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Create An Income Tax Exemption For Retirement And Survivor Benefits From The Uniformed Services.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-17HouseRe-referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2017-01-18HouseWITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR
2017-01-09HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
2016-11-15HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback