AR HB1001 | 2014 | 89th General Assembly Fiscal

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-14 - Notification that HB1001 is now Act 2
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Arkansas House Of Representatives Of The Eighty-ninth General Assembly Appropriation For The 2013-2014 Fiscal Year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Arkansas House Of Representatives Of The Eighty-ninth General Assembly Appropriation For The 2013-2014 Fiscal Year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-12 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-14HouseNotification that HB1001 is now Act 2
2014-02-13HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2014-02-13HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2014-02-12HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2014-02-12SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2014-02-12SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2014-02-12SenateRead the third time and passed.
2014-02-11SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2014-02-11SenateReceived from the House.
2014-02-11HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2014-02-11HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2014-02-10HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
2014-02-07HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback