AL SB83 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Assigned Act No. 2021-81.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Assigned Act No. 2021-81.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Higher education, state colleges and institutions, resident student status to minor children of military service members stationed in Ala. provided, status to remain valid even if the parent is reassigned out of state if student maintains continuous enrollment at the institution, Sec. 16-64-2 am'd.
Title
Higher education, state colleges and institutions, resident student status to minor children of military service members stationed in Ala. provided, status to remain valid even if the parent is reassigned out of state if student maintains continuous enrollment at the institution, Sec. 16-64-2 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 272 (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - HBIR: Lovvorn motion to Adopt Roll Call 271 (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 52 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - SBIR: Whatley motion to Adopt Roll Call 51 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - HBIR: Lovvorn motion to Adopt Roll Call 271 (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 52 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - SBIR: Whatley motion to Adopt Roll Call 51 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2021-81. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-03-09 | House | Signature Requested |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2021-03-04 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 272 |
2021-03-04 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-24 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 52 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Veterans and Military Affairs |