AL SB480 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Kinship guardianships, kinship guardianship subsidy program, established, procedures for establishing kinship guardianships and legal authority of kinship guardians, Sec. 12-15-301, 12-15-314, 12-15-315, 38-12-2, 38-12-4 am'd.
Title
Kinship guardianships, kinship guardianship subsidy program, established, procedures for establishing kinship guardianships and legal authority of kinship guardians, Sec. 12-15-301, 12-15-314, 12-15-315, 38-12-2, 38-12-4 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Judiciary | |
2010-04-14 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-04-08 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary | |
2010-04-08 | Engrossed | |
2010-04-06 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 736 | |
2010-04-06 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 735 | |
2010-04-06 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 734 | |
2010-04-06 | Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered | |
2010-04-06 | Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered | |
2010-04-06 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-09 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments | |
2010-02-25 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |