AL SB405 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Health
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Health
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Health care workers, infected health care workers, add Hepatitis C infection to definition of, Secs. 22-11A-60, 22-11A-61, 22-11A-62, 22-11A-63, 22-11A-66, 22-11A-67, 22-11A-73 am'd.
Title
Health care workers, infected health care workers, add Hepatitis C infection to definition of, Secs. 22-11A-60, 22-11A-61, 22-11A-62, 22-11A-63, 22-11A-66, 22-11A-67, 22-11A-73 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Melson [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-26 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | House | Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Health |
2015-06-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-05-26 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1211 |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services |