AL SB383 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Forwarded to Governor on May 2, 2012 at 6:00 p.m. on May 2, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Forwarded to Governor on May 2, 2012 at 6:00 p.m. on May 2, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Pharmacies, records, audit, minimum and uniform standards established, procedures, appeals, Pharmacy Audit Integrity Act
Title
Pharmacies, records, audit, minimum and uniform standards established, procedures, appeals, Pharmacy Audit Integrity Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Forwarded to Governor on May 2, 2012 at 6:00 p.m. on May 2, 2012 | |
2012-05-02 | Assigned Act No. 2012-306. | |
2012-05-02 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-02 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-02 | Passed Second House | |
2012-05-02 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1154 | |
2012-05-02 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-26 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-04-12 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health | |
2012-04-12 | Engrossed | |
2012-04-12 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 595 | |
2012-04-12 | Marsh motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 594 | |
2012-04-12 | Small Business first Substitute Offered | |
2012-04-12 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-05 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2012-03-01 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Small Business |