AL SB354 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Assigned Act No. 2016-322.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Assigned Act No. 2016-322.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Professions and Businesses, licensure of applicant for real estate professional, Sec. 34-27-32 am'd.
Title
Professions and Businesses, licensure of applicant for real estate professional, Sec. 34-27-32 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-28 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2016-322. |
2016-05-03 | House | Signature Requested |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2016-04-28 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 813 |
2016-04-28 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-04-26 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-04-19 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 632 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Glover motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |