AL SB327 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Assigned Act No. 2021-340.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Assigned Act No. 2021-340.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Teachers, math and science teachers, salary schedule, add'l compensation, Education Dept. to administer, add'l salary supplement for hard-to-staff schools, terms of employment contracts, fund created in State Treasury, commencing 2021-2022 school year, funding in education budget
Title
Teachers, math and science teachers, salary schedule, add'l compensation, Education Dept. to administer, add'l salary supplement for hard-to-staff schools, terms of employment contracts, fund created in State Treasury, commencing 2021-2022 school year, funding in education budget
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - Senate - Chesteen motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 1172 (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 973 (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 972 (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - HBIR: Baker motion to Adopt Roll Call 971 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 667 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt Roll Call 666 (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Chesteen motion to Adopt Roll Call 665 (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - SBIR: Chesteen motion to Adopt Roll Call 664 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 973 (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 972 (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - HBIR: Baker motion to Adopt Roll Call 971 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 667 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt Roll Call 666 (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Chesteen motion to Adopt Roll Call 665 (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - SBIR: Chesteen motion to Adopt Roll Call 664 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2021-340. |
2021-04-29 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2021-04-29 | House | Signature Requested |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Chesteen motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1172 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2021-04-27 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 973 |
2021-04-27 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 972 |
2021-04-27 | House | Ways and Means Education first Substitute Offered |
2021-04-27 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-22 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2021-03-18 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Engrossed |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 667 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Smitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 666 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Smitherman Amendment Offered |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Chesteen motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 665 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Chesteen first Substitute Offered |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Taxation Education as Favorable |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |
Same As/Similar To
HB537 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education