AL SB303 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Assigned Act No. 2017-169.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Assigned Act No. 2017-169.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Hytop, corp. limits alt.
Title
Hytop, corp. limits alt.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 79 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2017-169. |
2017-04-13 | House | Signature Requested |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2017-04-11 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 461 |
2017-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-06 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-04-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 430 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |