AL SB297 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Tax increment districts, provide that compensation may be determined solely by local governing body if a district is within a Major 21st Century Manufacturing Zone
Title
Tax increment districts, provide that compensation may be determined solely by local governing body if a district is within a Major 21st Century Manufacturing Zone
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-15 - Senate - Livingston motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | Senate | Indefinitely Postponed |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Livingston motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Livingston motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 393 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Livingston Amendment Offered |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |