AL SB27 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Assigned Act No. 2021-438.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Assigned Act No. 2021-438.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Auctioneers, State Board of, qualifications for licensure, annual single use auction license, inactive licenses, reciprocal licensing of apprentice auctioneer prohibited, conduct of auctions without a license, disciplinary actions pursuant to APA, board membership and meetings, Secs. 34-4-21, 34-4-23, 34-4-25, 34-4-27, 34-4-28, 34-4-29, 34-4-30, 34-4-31, 34-4-33, 34-4-50, 34-4-52 am'd.
Title
Auctioneers, State Board of, qualifications for licensure, annual single use auction license, inactive licenses, reciprocal licensing of apprentice auctioneer prohibited, conduct of auctions without a license, disciplinary actions pursuant to APA, board membership and meetings, Secs. 34-4-21, 34-4-23, 34-4-25, 34-4-27, 34-4-28, 34-4-29, 34-4-30, 34-4-31, 34-4-33, 34-4-50, 34-4-52 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Randy Price [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1100 (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - HBIR: Isbell motion to Adopt Roll Call 1099 (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 186 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Price motion to Adopt Roll Call 185 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - SBIR: Price motion to Adopt Roll Call 184 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - HBIR: Isbell motion to Adopt Roll Call 1099 (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 186 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Price motion to Adopt Roll Call 185 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - SBIR: Price motion to Adopt Roll Call 184 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2021-438. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-05-04 | House | Signature Requested |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2021-04-29 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1100 |
2021-04-29 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-24 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 186 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Price motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 185 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB100 (Same As) 2021-04-29 - Isbell motion to Substitute SB27 For HB100 adopted Voice Vote
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
34 | 4 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 4 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 4 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 4 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 4 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 4 | 29 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 4 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 4 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 4 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 4 | 50 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 4 | 52 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |