AL SB27 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-16 - Pending third reading on day 15 Favorable from Constitution, Campaigns and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-16 - Pending third reading on day 15 Favorable from Constitution, Campaigns and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Article X, Homestead exemptions, repealed and readopted as a new Article X to the Constitution of Alabama of 1901, const. amend.
Title
Article X, Homestead exemptions, repealed and readopted as a new Article X to the Constitution of Alabama of 1901, const. amend.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-16 | House | Pending third reading on day 15 Favorable from Constitution, Campaigns and Elections |
2015-04-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-04-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Engrossed |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 411 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 410 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Constitution, Ethics and Elections Amendment Offered |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Ethics and Elections |