AL SB252 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alabama Growth Alliance Bill
Title
Alabama Growth Alliance Bill
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Reed [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Senate - Reed Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee - Roll Call 662 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 683 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 682 MME3HWW-1 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 681 P3I9ERG-1 (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 680 P7Y9EER-1 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - House - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 361 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt - Roll Call 360 LXBGWAW-1 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Coleman motion to Adopt - Roll Call 359 Z8VGRWK-1 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Coleman motion to Adopt - Roll Call 358 UP7MGGD-1 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Givhan motion to Adopt - Roll Call 357 YI3U2N6-1 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Givhan motion to Adopt - Roll Call 356 PMZNEEE-1 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 683 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 682 MME3HWW-1 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 681 P3I9ERG-1 (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 680 P7Y9EER-1 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - House - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 361 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt - Roll Call 360 LXBGWAW-1 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Coleman motion to Adopt - Roll Call 359 Z8VGRWK-1 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Coleman motion to Adopt - Roll Call 358 UP7MGGD-1 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Givhan motion to Adopt - Roll Call 357 YI3U2N6-1 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Givhan motion to Adopt - Roll Call 356 PMZNEEE-1 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | Senate | Enacted |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Enacted |
2024-05-08 | House | Signature Requested |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Ready to Enroll |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Conference Committee Substitute Adopted ZVSFKWK-1 |
2024-04-23 | House | Shedd Accede - Adopted Voice Vote |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Reed Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee - Adopted Roll Call 662 |
2024-04-18 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 683 |
2024-04-18 | House | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 682 MME3HWW-1 |
2024-04-18 | House | Fidler 1st Amendment Offered MME3HWW-1 |
2024-04-18 | House | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 681 P3I9ERG-1 |
2024-04-18 | House | Shedd 1st Amendment Offered P3I9ERG-1 |
2024-04-18 | House | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 680 P7Y9EER-1 |
2024-04-18 | House | Fiscal Responsibility Engrossed Substitute Offered P7Y9EER-1 |
2024-04-18 | House | Third Reading in Second House |
2024-04-16 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-16 | House | Reported Out of Committee Second House from House Fiscal Responsibility P7Y9EER-1 |
2024-04-16 | House | Fiscal Responsibility 1st Amendment R3PCMYM-1 |
2024-04-11 | House | Pending House Fiscal Responsibility |
2024-04-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Fiscal Responsibility |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Engrossed |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 361 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 360 LXBGWAW-1 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Orr 1st Amendment Offered LXBGWAW-1 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Coleman motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 359 Z8VGRWK-1 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Coleman 2nd Amendment Offered Z8VGRWK-1 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Coleman motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 358 UP7MGGD-1 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Coleman 1st Amendment Offered UP7MGGD-1 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Givhan motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 357 YI3U2N6-1 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Givhan 1st Amendment Offered YI3U2N6-1 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Givhan motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 356 PMZNEEE-1 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development 1st Amendment Offered PMZNEEE-1 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development 1st Amendment PMZNEEE-1 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development 1st Amendment PMZNEEE-1 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development 1st Amendment PMZNEEE-1 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Pending Senate Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
Same As/Similar To
HB372 (Same As) 2024-05-07 - Currently Indefinitely Postponed