AL SB234 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-01 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-01 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Gambling devices, possession, penalty increased, Sec. 13A-12-27 am'd.
Title
Gambling devices, possession, penalty increased, Sec. 13A-12-27 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-31 - Senate - Sanders motion to Carry Over Temporarily (Y: 10 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | Indefinitely Postponed | |
2011-05-31 | Marsh motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote | |
2011-05-31 | Third Reading Carried Over | |
2011-05-31 | Further Consideration | |
2011-05-31 | Sanders motion to Carry Over Temporarily lost Roll Call 820 | |
2011-05-31 | Taylor first Substitute Offered | |
2011-05-31 | Third Reading Carried Over | |
2011-04-14 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-03-22 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |