AL SB220 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Transportation and Energy first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Transportation and Energy first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Highway, roads, and bridges, contracts or subcontracts for public works, provisions requiring a party to indemnify another party for damages caused by the other party prohibited
Title
Highway, roads, and bridges, contracts or subcontracts for public works, provisions requiring a party to indemnify another party for damages caused by the other party prohibited
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 755 (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - HBIR: McMillan motion to Adopt Roll Call 754 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 527 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Scofield motion to Adopt Roll Call 526 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Scofield motion to Adopt Roll Call 525 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - SBIR: Scofield motion to Adopt Roll Call 524 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - HBIR: McMillan motion to Adopt Roll Call 754 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 527 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Scofield motion to Adopt Roll Call 526 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Scofield motion to Adopt Roll Call 525 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - SBIR: Scofield motion to Adopt Roll Call 524 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Transportation and Energy first Amendment Offered |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2021-244. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-04-13 | House | Signature Requested |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2021-04-13 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 755 |
2021-04-13 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-03-18 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-03-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 527 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Scofield motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 526 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Transportation and Energy Amendment Offered |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Scofield motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 525 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Transportation and Energy first Substitute Offered |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 1 amendment |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
HB234 (Same As) 2021-05-06 - Indefinitely Postponed