AL SB205 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-13 - Pending third reading on day 23 Favorable from Commerce and Small Business
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-13 - Pending third reading on day 23 Favorable from Commerce and Small Business
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Home inspectors, limitations period or liability, provided, Sec. 34-14B-11 added; Sec. 34-14B-3 am'd.
Title
Home inspectors, limitations period or liability, provided, Sec. 34-14B-11 added; Sec. 34-14B-3 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 607 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Allen motion to Adopt Roll Call 606 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - SBIR: Allen motion to Adopt Roll Call 605 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Allen motion to Adopt Roll Call 606 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - SBIR: Allen motion to Adopt Roll Call 605 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | House | Pending third reading on day 23 Favorable from Commerce and Small Business |
2021-04-13 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-03-18 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Engrossed |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 607 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Allen motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 606 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development first Substitute Offered |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
Same As/Similar To
HB401 (Same As) 2021-05-06 - Indefinitely Postponed
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
34 | 14B | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 14B | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |