AL SB184 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-08 - Pending third reading on day 18 Favorable from Ways and Means General Fund
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-08 - Pending third reading on day 18 Favorable from Ways and Means General Fund
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Peace officers and firefighters, injury or death benefits, certain wildland firefighters eligible, Peace Officers' and Firefighters' Death Benefit Fund, created, conditional appropriation, Sec. 36-30-6.1 added; Secs. 36-30-1, 36-30-6 am'd.
Title
Peace officers and firefighters, injury or death benefits, certain wildland firefighters eligible, Peace Officers' and Firefighters' Death Benefit Fund, created, conditional appropriation, Sec. 36-30-6.1 added; Secs. 36-30-1, 36-30-6 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | House | Pending third reading on day 18 Favorable from Ways and Means General Fund |
2019-05-08 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 372 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Reported from Governmental Affairs as Favorable |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |