AL SB15 | 2016 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-08-23 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections
Pending: House Constitution, Campaigns and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on August 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-08-23 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections
Pending: House Constitution, Campaigns and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Elected or appointed officials, except for judges, maximum age limitation repealed, general law providing an age restriction prohibited, const. amend.
Title
Elected or appointed officials, except for judges, maximum age limitation repealed, general law providing an age restriction prohibited, const. amend.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections |
2016-08-23 | Senate | Engrossed |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 40 |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 39 |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Tourism and Marketing Amendment Offered |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-08-17 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Tourism and Marketing |