AL SB111 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Assigned Act No. 2021-175.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Assigned Act No. 2021-175.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Taxation, sales of land for taxes, conducted on premises of or within courthouse or courthouse annex, Sec. 40-10-15 am'd.
Title
Taxation, sales of land for taxes, conducted on premises of or within courthouse or courthouse annex, Sec. 40-10-15 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Butler [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 591 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - HBIR: Hill motion to Adopt Roll Call 590 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 304 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - SBIR: Butler motion to Adopt Roll Call 303 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - HBIR: Hill motion to Adopt Roll Call 590 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 304 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - SBIR: Butler motion to Adopt Roll Call 303 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2021-175. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-04-01 | House | Signature Requested |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2021-04-01 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 591 |
2021-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-03-11 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-03-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 304 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB201 (Same As) 2021-05-17 - Delivered to Governor at 7:24 p.m. on May 17, 2021.