AL HB201 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-17 - Delivered to Governor at 7:24 p.m. on May 17, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-17 - Delivered to Governor at 7:24 p.m. on May 17, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Taxation, sales of land for taxes, conducted on premises of or within courthouse or courthouse annex, Sec. 40-10-15 am'd.
Title
Taxation, sales of land for taxes, conducted on premises of or within courthouse or courthouse annex, Sec. 40-10-15 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1441 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - SBIR: Shelnutt motion to Adopt Roll Call 1440 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 131 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - HBIR: Hill motion to Adopt Roll Call 130 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - SBIR: Shelnutt motion to Adopt Roll Call 1440 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 131 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - HBIR: Hill motion to Adopt Roll Call 130 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-17 | House | Delivered to Governor at 7:24 p.m. on May 17, 2021. |
2021-05-17 | House | Assigned Act No. 2021-521. |
2021-05-17 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2021-05-17 | House | Enrolled |
2021-05-17 | House | Passed Second House |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1441 |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2021-02-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 131 |
2021-02-23 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-10 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government |
Same As/Similar To
SB111 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Assigned Act No. 2021-175.