AL HJR9 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-19 - Delivered to Governor on February 19, 2013 at 2:54 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-19 - Delivered to Governor on February 19, 2013 at 2:54 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
University of Alabama in Huntsville, support of economic, technological, and workforce development, commended
Title
University of Alabama in Huntsville, support of economic, technological, and workforce development, commended
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-19 | House | Delivered to Governor on February 19, 2013 at 2:54 p.m. |
2013-02-19 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-15. |
2013-02-19 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2013-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2013-02-19 | House | Passed Second House |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2013-02-07 | House | McCutcheon motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2013-02-07 | House | Reported from Rules |
2013-02-05 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |