AL HJR85 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 21 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 21 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law Enforcement Officers, Medal of Honor, calling a joint session
Title
Law Enforcement Officers, Medal of Honor, calling a joint session
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | House | |
2015-04-21 | House | Forwarded to Executive Department on April 21, 2015 |
2015-04-21 | House | Enrolled |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2015-04-21 | House | Passed Second House |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 577 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2015-04-02 | House | McCutcheon motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2015-04-02 | House | Reported from Rules |
2015-03-31 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |