AL HJR79 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Delivered to Governor at 9:30 a.m. on March 10, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Delivered to Governor at 9:30 a.m. on March 10, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Triple Negative Breast Cancer Awareness Day, March 3, 2022, and month of March as Triple Negative Breast Cancer Awareness Month, declared
Title
Triple Negative Breast Cancer Awareness Day, March 3, 2022, and month of March as Triple Negative Breast Cancer Awareness Month, declared
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:30 a.m. on March 10, 2022. |
2022-03-10 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-137. |
2022-03-10 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-03-09 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-09 | House | Passed Second House |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2022-02-23 | House | Cosponsors Added |
2022-02-23 | House | Jones (M) motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2022-02-23 | House | Reported from Rules |
2022-02-17 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |