AL HJR6 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Hollis Isbell, 2024 Auburn University College of Agriculture Hall of Honor inductee, commended
Title
Hollis Isbell, 2024 Auburn University College of Agriculture Hall of Honor inductee, commended
Sponsors
Rep. Jamie Kiel [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Enacted |
2024-02-29 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2024-02-29 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-29 | House | Ready to Enroll |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Reported from RULES from Senate RULES |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Pending Senate RULES |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate and referred to the Senate committee on RULES |
2024-02-20 | House | Lovvorn motion to Adopt - Adopted Voice Vote |
2024-02-20 | House | Reported from RULES from House RULES |
2024-02-20 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-06 | House | Pending House RULES |
2024-02-06 | House | Received in the House and referred to the House committee on RULES |