AL HJR500 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Delivered to Governor at 2:10 p.m. on March 25, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Delivered to Governor at 2:10 p.m. on March 25, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Maise, Willie, commended
Title
Maise, Willie, commended
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Delivered to Governor at 2:10 p.m. on March 25, 2010. | |
2010-03-25 | Assigned Act No. 2010-317. | |
2010-03-25 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2010-03-25 | Signature Requested | |
2010-03-25 | Enrolled | |
2010-03-25 | Passed Second House | |
2010-03-23 | Denton motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-03-23 | Reported from Rules | |
2010-03-11 | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules | |
2010-03-04 | Buskey motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-03-04 | Reported from Rules | |
2010-03-03 | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |