AL HJR327 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Forwarded to Governor on May 3, 2017 at 5:49 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Forwarded to Governor on May 3, 2017 at 5:49 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Armistead, Emily Golson, death mourned
Title
Armistead, Emily Golson, death mourned
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | House | Forwarded to Governor on May 3, 2017 at 5:49 p.m. |
2017-05-03 | House | Assigned Act No. 2017-285. |
2017-05-03 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2017-05-03 | House | Enrolled |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2017-05-03 | House | Passed Second House |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2017-04-27 | House | Boothe motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported from Rules |
2017-04-20 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |