AL HJR267 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Rules first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Carter, Wytasha; Russell, Wallace; Deane, Shaun; Lucas, Thomas; Swinney, John; Tolliver, Marlon; Moore, Stephen; Wesley, Frederick; Alexander, Frank; Slaughter, Vonric; and Irwin, Paul, nominees for the 2017 Alabama Legislative Medal of Honor for Law Enforcement, commended

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Carter, Wytasha; Russell, Wallace; Deane, Shaun; Lucas, Thomas; Swinney, John; Tolliver, Marlon; Moore, Stephen; Wesley, Frederick; Alexander, Frank; Slaughter, Vonric; and Irwin, Paul, nominees for the 2017 Alabama Legislative Medal of Honor for Law Enforcement, commended

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - House - Ball motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19SenateRules first Substitute Offered
2017-05-19HouseDelivered to Governor at 7:29 p.m. on May 19, 2017.
2017-05-19HouseAssigned Act No. 2017-356.
2017-05-19HouseClerk of the House Certification
2017-05-19SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2017-05-19HouseEnrolled
2017-05-19HouseBall motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1045
2017-05-19HouseConcurrence Requested
2017-05-19SenateWaggoner motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2017-05-19SenateMotion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2017-05-19SenateWaggoner first Substitute Offered
2017-05-19SenateReported from Rules with 1 substitute and
2017-04-20SenateReceived in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules
2017-04-13HouseJohnson (R) motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2017-04-13HouseReported from Rules
2017-04-11HouseIntroduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback