AL HJR193 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on March 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-06 - Rules first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on March 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-06 - Rules first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Waterfront Access Study Committee, extended to tenth Legislative day of the 2015 Regular Session
Title
Waterfront Access Study Committee, extended to tenth Legislative day of the 2015 Regular Session
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | Senate | Rules first Substitute Offered |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Forwarded to Governor at 1:15 p.m. on March 6, 2014. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Forwarded to Governor at 1:15 p.m. on March 6, 2014. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2014-151. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2014-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2014-03-06 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2014-03-06 | House | Passed Second House |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2014-03-04 | House | Engrossed |
2014-03-04 | House | McCutcheon motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-04 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-04 | House | Rules Substitute Offered |
2014-03-04 | House | Reported from Rules with 1 substitute and |
2014-02-20 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |