AL HJR187 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Delivered to Governor at 1:30 p.m. on April 6, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Delivered to Governor at 1:30 p.m. on April 6, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Rainbow Omega, commended
Title
Rainbow Omega, commended
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Wood [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | House | Delivered to Governor at 1:30 p.m. on April 6, 2017. |
2017-04-06 | House | Assigned Act No. 2017-135. |
2017-04-06 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2017-04-06 | House | Enrolled |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed Second House |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2017-04-04 | House | Boothe motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2017-04-04 | House | Reported from Rules |
2017-03-15 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |