AL HJR16 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-19 - Delivered to Governor on February 19, 2013 at 2:54 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-19 - Delivered to Governor on February 19, 2013 at 2:54 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Bentley, Wayne, commended
Title
Bentley, Wayne, commended
Sponsors
Rep. Kerry Rich [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-19 | House | Delivered to Governor on February 19, 2013 at 2:54 p.m. |
2013-02-19 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-18. |
2013-02-19 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2013-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2013-02-19 | House | Passed Second House |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2013-02-07 | House | McCutcheon motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2013-02-07 | House | Reported from Rules |
2013-02-05 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |