AL HJR125 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Delivered to Governor at 3:59 p.m. on March 30, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Delivered to Governor at 3:59 p.m. on March 30, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Barnette, James R., death mourned
Title
Barnette, James R., death mourned
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Carns [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | House | Delivered to Governor at 3:59 p.m. on March 30, 2021. |
2021-03-30 | House | Assigned Act No. 2021-153. |
2021-03-30 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2021-03-30 | House | Enrolled |
2021-03-30 | House | Passed Second House |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2021-03-18 | House | Jones (M) motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2021-03-18 | House | Reported from Rules |
2021-03-11 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |