AL HJR106 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-12)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Forwarded to Governor at 2:55 p.m. on April 6, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-12)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Forwarded to Governor at 2:55 p.m. on April 6, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Rare Kidney Disease Awareness Month, recognized
Title
Rare Kidney Disease Awareness Month, recognized
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | Forwarded to Governor at 2:55 p.m. on April 6, 2021. |
2021-04-06 | House | Assigned Act No. 2021-190. |
2021-04-06 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2021-04-06 | House | Enrolled |
2021-04-06 | House | Passed Second House |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2021-03-18 | House | Jones (M) motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2021-03-18 | House | Reported from Rules |
2021-03-09 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |