AL HB86 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - Delivered to Governor at 12:20 p.m. on May 7, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - Delivered to Governor at 12:20 p.m. on May 7, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles, commercial, compliance with Federal rules, 49 CFR 385, 386, and 387 included in compliance and enforcement, Sec. 32-9A-2 am'd.
Title
Motor vehicles, commercial, compliance with Federal rules, 49 CFR 385, 386, and 387 included in compliance and enforcement, Sec. 32-9A-2 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Lynn Greer [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | House | Delivered to Governor at 12:20 p.m. on May 7, 2013. |
2013-05-07 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-207. |
2013-05-07 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2013-05-02 | House | Enrolled |
2013-05-02 | House | Passed Second House |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 785 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2013-02-26 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 143 |
2013-02-26 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-14 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-02-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure |