AL HB689 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Guin motion to temporarily carry over adopted voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Guin motion to temporarily carry over adopted voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Walker Co., ad valorem tax, senior property tax appraisal, taxpayers 65 and older, assessed value of property frozen for principal residences of 10 years or more, const. amend.
Title
Walker Co., ad valorem tax, senior property tax appraisal, taxpayers 65 and older, assessed value of property frozen for principal residences of 10 years or more, const. amend.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Guin [D] | Rep. Tommy Sherer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Guin motion to temporarily carry over adopted voice vote | |
2010-04-14 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2010-04-14 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1070 | |
2010-04-14 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-13 | Guin motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-04-13 | Third Reading Carried Over | |
2010-04-08 | Guin motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-04-08 | Third Reading Carried Over | |
2010-04-06 | Guin motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-04-06 | Hammett motion to reconsider adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-04-06 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass lost Roll Call 817 | |
2010-04-06 | Third Reading Carried Over | |
2010-03-30 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-03-09 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |