AL HB668 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Delivered to Governor at 3:20 p.m. on April 22, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Delivered to Governor at 3:20 p.m. on April 22, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Municipal housing authorities, members, one member to be resident of public housing or recipient of housing assistance, if member ceases to meet qualifications, new member to be appointed, Sec. 24-1-24.1 added
Title
Municipal housing authorities, members, one member to be resident of public housing or recipient of housing assistance, if member ceases to meet qualifications, new member to be appointed, Sec. 24-1-24.1 added
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-22 | Delivered to Governor at 3:20 p.m. on April 22, 2010. | |
2010-04-22 | Assigned Act No. 2010-714. | |
2010-04-22 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2010-04-22 | Signature Requested | |
2010-04-22 | Enrolled | |
2010-04-22 | Passed Second House | |
2010-04-22 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1213 | |
2010-04-22 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-14 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-04-08 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs | |
2010-04-06 | Engrossed | |
2010-04-06 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 844 | |
2010-04-06 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 843 | |
2010-04-06 | County and Municipal Government Substitute Offered | |
2010-04-06 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-11 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2010-03-03 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government |