AL HB639 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-02 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-02 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Motor Vehicles, dump trucks, operation with bed raised prohibited, penalties
Title
Motor Vehicles, dump trucks, operation with bed raised prohibited, penalties
Sponsors
Rep. Allen Treadaway [R] | Rep. Micky Hammon [R] | Rep. Mike Ball [R] | Rep. Arthur Payne [R] |
Rep. Mike Hill [R] | Rep. Dickie Drake [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Judiciary |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-25 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 938 |
2013-04-25 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-23 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-18 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |