AL HB593 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Delivered to Governor at 5:49 p.m. on May 19, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Delivered to Governor at 5:49 p.m. on May 19, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Walker Co., sheriff authorized to sell certain abandoned, unclaimed, or stolen property and firearms, notice, record keeping requirement, distribution of funds for law enforcement purposes
Title
Walker Co., sheriff authorized to sell certain abandoned, unclaimed, or stolen property and firearms, notice, record keeping requirement, distribution of funds for law enforcement purposes
Sponsors
Rep. Connie Rowe [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 57 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2017-05-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 57 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | House | Delivered to Governor at 5:49 p.m. on May 19, 2017. |
2017-05-19 | House | Assigned Act No. 2017-456. |
2017-05-19 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2017-05-19 | House | Enrolled |
2017-05-19 | House | Passed Second House |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1309 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2017-05-17 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 931 |
2017-05-17 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-05-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-05-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |