AL HB572 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Delivered to Governor at 2:13 p. m. on May 3, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Delivered to Governor at 2:13 p. m. on May 3, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Russell County, county commission, operation of appraisal office, clarification re responsibility of State Revenue Commissioner, Act 343, 1976 Reg. Sess., am'd
Title
Russell County, county commission, operation of appraisal office, clarification re responsibility of State Revenue Commissioner, Act 343, 1976 Reg. Sess., am'd
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 39 Abs: 28) [FAIL]
2012-04-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 39 Abs: 28) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-03 | Delivered to Governor at 2:13 p. m. on May 3, 2012. | |
2012-05-03 | Assigned Act No. 2012-325. | |
2012-05-03 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-05-03 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-03 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-03 | Passed Second House | |
2012-05-03 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 979 | |
2012-05-03 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-24 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-04-10 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2012-04-10 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 624 | |
2012-04-10 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-05 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-03-20 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |