AL HB546 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Forwarded to Governor on May 20, 2013 at 10:25 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Forwarded to Governor on May 20, 2013 at 10:25 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alabama Family Trust, definitions of contributor and settlor added, references to donor replaced with defined terms contributor or settlor, reimbursement upon death of life beneficiary to other jurisdictions for certain public benefits, Secs. 38-9B-2, 38-9B-3, 38-9B-5, 38-9B-6, 38-9B-7 am'd.
Title
Alabama Family Trust, definitions of contributor and settlor added, references to donor replaced with defined terms contributor or settlor, reimbursement upon death of life beneficiary to other jurisdictions for certain public benefits, Secs. 38-9B-2, 38-9B-3, 38-9B-5, 38-9B-6, 38-9B-7 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 52) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 52) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | House | Forwarded to Governor on May 20, 2013 at 10:25 p.m. on May 20, 2013. |
2013-05-20 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-366. |
2013-05-20 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2013-05-20 | House | Enrolled |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2013-05-20 | House | Passed Second House |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1131 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2013-04-25 | House | Cosponsors Added |
2013-04-25 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 930 |
2013-04-25 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-18 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |